This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 16:52:24 (UTC).

On Deck Capital Inc VS Jelco Electric L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 On Deck Capital Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Jelco Electric L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Popham, Jr, Gary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1664

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Popham, Jr, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

On Deck Capital Inc

Defendants

Joseph Hodge

Jelco Electric L L C

Other

Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danny Ford

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:1/11/2021) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(4))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: On Deck Capital Inc Judgment Against: Jelco Electric L L C Judgment Against: Joseph Hodge, Amount: $151,630.60, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: On Deck Capital Inc Judgment Against: Jelco Electric L L C Judgment Against: Joseph Hodge, Amount: $11,442.87, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: IN THE ARLINGTON COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less