This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 13:58:51 (UTC).

Oma Pearl Payne, Larry Wayne Stalter Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2000 Oma Pearl Payne, Larry Wayne Stalter was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0913

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Andrew

 

Party Details

Decedent

Oma Pearl Payne

Not Classified By Court

Larry Wayne Stalter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Ronald Cooley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/06/2010

CST - Closing Statement (docket date:4/7/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

413 - Citation (docket date:3/11/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2006

LOR - Location Reassignment (docket date:3/9/2006)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2000

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:4/10/2000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2000

NOT - Notice (docket date:3/10/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2000

NOTE: TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2000

NHD - Notice To Heirs/Devisee (docket date:3/10/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2000

NOTE: OF INFORMAL PROBATE OF WILL & APPT OF PERSONAL REP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2000

PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:3/10/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:3/8/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

WIL - Will (docket date:3/8/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

NOTE: 5 PAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

LTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:3/8/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

NOTE: OF PERSONAL REP & ACCEPTANCE LARRY WAYNE STALTER W/O RESTRICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate (docket date:3/8/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

NOTE: OF WILL & APPT OF PERSONAL REP LARRY WAYNE STALTER W/O BOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2000

OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement (docket date:3/8/2000) (filing party: Personal Representative(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less