This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/11/2020 at 12:14:14 (UTC).

Norma J Dokken VS Lisa Pelletier

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Norma J Dokken filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Lisa Pelletier. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bergin, Dawn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2334

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bergin, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Norma J Dokken

Respondent

Lisa Pelletier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brandy Ramsay

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less