This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/29/2020 at 03:44:36 (UTC).

Nordstrom Inc Et Al VS Maricopa County

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Nordstrom Inc filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Maricopa County. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Viola, Danielle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0903

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Viola, Danielle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scottsdale Fashion Square L L C

Nordstrom Inc

Defendant

Maricopa County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Moore

Defendant Attorney

Peter Muthig

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant Maricopa County's Answer to Complaint and Notice of Appeal of Property Valuation - Co-chg $230 Receipt # 27979749

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less