This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/24/2020 at 09:29:42 (UTC).

Noemy Fernandez Valenzuela VS Noe Fernandez Magallanes

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Noemy Fernandez Valenzuela filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Noe Fernandez Magallanes. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rassas, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5676

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rassas, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Noemy Fernandez Valenzuela

Respondent

Noe Fernandez Magallanes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket903 - ME: Judgment/Decree (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Judgment: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less