This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:12:21 (UTC).

Noemi Rodriguez VS Kimberly Rebecca Werner

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Noemi Rodriguez filed an Other lawsuit against Kimberly Rebecca Werner. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5193

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noemi Rodriguez

Defendant

Kimberly Rebecca Werner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Ramirez

Defendant Attorney

David Amundsen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Jury Demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: KIMBERLY REBECCA WERNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOHN DOE WERNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less