This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 11:32:24 (UTC).

Nicole Michelle Guajardo VS Joshua David Guajardo

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Nicole Michelle Guajardo filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Joshua David Guajardo. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponce, Adele. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6917

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ponce, Adele

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Nicole Michelle Guajardo

Nicole Michele Guajardo

Respondent

Joshua David Guajardo

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Audra Petrolle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket003 - ME: Hearing Reset (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Hair Follicle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Petitioner/Wifes Separate Prehearing Statement For Evidentiary Hearing Set for October 2, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: VIDEO CONFERENCE / RE EMERGENCY TEMPORARY ORDERS WITHOUT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PRE-DECREE / WITHOUT NOTICE FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less