This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/17/2020 at 10:25:49 (UTC).

Nicholas A Ellison VS Courtney D Ellison

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Nicholas A Ellison filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Courtney D Ellison. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5687

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nicholas A Ellison

Respondent

Courtney D Ellison

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Samuel Randall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Intent to File Consent Decree for Dissolution a Non-Covenant Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF REQUIREMENT OF STRICT COMPLIANE OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less