Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 07:39:32 (UTC).

National Tax Lien Redemption Services L L C VS Jerry W Miller Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2014 National Tax Lien Redemption Services L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Jerry W Miller. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2938

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Tax Lien Redemption Services L L C

Defendants

Jerry W Miller

J P Morgan Chase Bank N A

City Of Avondale

Ricketts Investment Company

Robert J Stump

Deanna Jo Methiesen

Surety Insurance Company Of California

City Of Peoria

Norman Frank Wahlrab

Mary Jean Wahlrab

Lynda Almeida

Tempe Gardens Townhouse Corp

Ernesto Nevarez

Delma Escalante

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather Hendrix

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2015
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • RNM - Returned Mail Minute Entry (docket date:4/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • RNM - Returned Mail Minute Entry (docket date:4/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:4/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:3/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • RNM - Returned Mail Minute Entry (docket date:3/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2014
  • NOTE: CITY OF PEORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/7/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • NOTE: CITY OF AVONDALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/7/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • NOTE: BANK OF AMERICAN N A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/7/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • NOTE: BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/9/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/9/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/9/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less