This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 06:41:39 (UTC).

Nathan Akins VS Stephanie Akins

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Nathan Akins filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Stephanie Akins. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Minder, Scott and Nicholls, Suzanne. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4847

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Minder, Scott

Nicholls, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nathan Akins

Respondent

Stephanie Akins

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Stephanie Akins Judgment Against: Nathan Akins, Amount: $2,054.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Child Support Arrearage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Decree of Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDDI - Decree Of Dissolution (docket date:8/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:8/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement (docket date:7/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing; Result: Under Advisement Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:6/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:6/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:7/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:7/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:7/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:7/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:7/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:7/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:7/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:7/18/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less