This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 02:34:47 (UTC).

Nancy Olmedo VS Francisco V Olmedo

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Nancy Olmedo filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Francisco. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Mandell, Michael and Crandell, Rusty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6852

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Mandell, Michael

Crandell, Rusty

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nancy Olmedo

Respondent

Francisco V Olmedo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/5/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCME - Credit Memo (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less