This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 13:06:33 (UTC).

Myron Lee Smith, Agnes Caroline Smith Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 Myron Lee Smith, Agnes Caroline Smith was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2165

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Myron Lee Smith

Decedent

Agnes Caroline Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Florence Bruemmer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/16/2018

CST - Closing Statement (docket date:1/18/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2018

NOTE: AND PROOF OF MAILING/DELIVERY CLOSING STATEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2017

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:10/5/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2017

INV INVENTORY CONFIDENTIAL (docket date:9/20/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

NOT - Notice (docket date:9/12/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

NOTE: OF FORMAL PROBATE OF A WILL AND FORMAL APPOINTMENT OF A PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ADMISSION OF WILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

NOT - Notice (docket date:9/12/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

NOTE: TO CREDITORS OF FORMAL APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND/OR FORMAL PROBATE OF A WILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:9/13/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

NOTE: OF NOTICE FORMAL APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ADMISSION OF WILL TO PROBATE ORDER TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
07/19/2017

NOTE: DOUGLAS W PUSATERI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

WOB - Waiver Of Bond (docket date:7/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

NOTE: MYRON LEE SMITH JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

CAP - Consent To Appointment (docket date:7/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

NOTE: CAROL PHILLIPS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:7/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

NOTE: MYRON LEE SMITH JR / PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

NIP - Notice Of Informal Probate (docket date:7/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement (docket date:7/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

WIL - Will (docket date:7/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less