This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:53:48 (UTC).

Mountain Terrace North Homeowners Association VS Christine M Collotta Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Mountain Terrace North Homeowners Association filed an Other lawsuit against Christine M Collotta. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Warner, Randall. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1689

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Warner, Randall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mountain Terrace North Homeowners Association

Defendants

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

Christopher L Dewitt

Christine M Collotta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC MERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CHRISTOPHER L DEWITT AND CHRISTINE M COLLOTTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less