Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:48:32 (UTC).

Mortgage Notes Foreclosure L L C VS Maricopa County Treasurer

Case Summary

On 02/13/2008 Mortgage Notes Foreclosure L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Maricopa County Treasurer. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0516

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2008

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mortgage Notes Foreclosure L L C

Defendant

Maricopa County Treasurer

In Re

Eliza Roylance

Arizona Federal Credit Union

W M C Mortgage Corp

Chris Bank

Justin Roylance

Shawna Baker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rex Anderson

In Re Attorneys

J Lake

Wade Burgeson

Scott Malm

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2008
  • OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds (docket date:7/3/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2008
  • AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:5/28/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2008
  • NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 03/31/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:5/23/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • NOTE: SERVED BY MAIL ON 03/10/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2008
  • AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:5/22/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2008
  • NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 04/03/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • 019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:5/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2008
  • 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set (docket date:4/29/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2008
  • CRT - Certification Of Mailing (docket date:4/22/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2008
  • NOTE: APPLICATION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS, PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • APL - Application (docket date:3/5/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • NOTE: FOR RELEASE OF PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812(E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/27/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • NOTE: AMENDED / MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED ON 02/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:2/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2008
  • NOTE: TREASURER OF MARICOPA COUNTY SERVED 2-14-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/14/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/14/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less