This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 13:08:35 (UTC).

Molina Suer, Party is a minor: name not published Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 Molina Suer, Party is a minor name not published was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2229

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Molina Suer

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/21/2017

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2017

NOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:12/7/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2017

NOTE: COPY OF PROOF OF RESTRICTED ACCOUNT AND REQUEST THAT IT BE FILED AS A DUPLICATE ORIGINAL OR THAT COURT RECORD BE CORRECTED DUE TO MIS-NUMBERING OF DOCUMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2017

087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued (docket date:11/13/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2017

OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel (docket date:9/29/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2017

421- Appoint Guardian/Consev (docket date:9/20/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2017

PRD - Proof Of Restricted Account (docket date:12/4/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2017

NOTE: FROM DEPOSITORY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2017

MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel (docket date:9/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2017

NOTE: AND CONSENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
09/18/2017

LTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:9/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2017

NOTE: MOLINA SUER WITH RESTRICTIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2017

AFF - Affidavit (docket date:8/25/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2017

NOTE: OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2017

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:8/17/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2017

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:8/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2017

PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:8/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2017

AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee (docket date:8/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2017

PTT - Petition (docket date:8/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2017

NOTE: FOR AUTHORITY TO COMPROMISE TO INVEST FUNDS AND TO WAIVE ACCOUNTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less