This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 06:26:08 (UTC).

Miles K Cox VS Robin B Cox

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Miles K Cox filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Robin B Cox. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Wein, Kevin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Wein, Kevin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Miles K Cox

Respondents

Robin B Cox

Robin Mitchell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOWH - Order Supp Appl W/Out Hearing (docket date:9/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketSWD - Supp Appl For Waiver/Deferral of Costs (docket date:9/3/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:6/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket029 - ME: Status Conference (docket date:5/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • HearingEvent: Status Conference; Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:4/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: Early Resolution Conference; Result: Full Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:1/28/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:1/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:1/28/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/28/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/27/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less