This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/15/2018 at 10:42:17 (UTC).

Midland Funding L L C VS Raymondo Galvan Sosa

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 Midland Funding L L C filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Raymondo Galvan Sosa. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Garbarino, David. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3060

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Garbarino, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding L L C

Defendant

Raymondo Galvan Sosa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhett Flaming-Buschman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2017

ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment (docket date:9/22/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

TJU - Judgment (docket date:8/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

NOTE: CERTIFIED COPY FROM SOUTH MOUNTAIN PRECINT JUSTICE COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:8/21/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

Judgment For: Midland Funding L L C Judgment Against: Raymondo Galvan Sosa, Amount: $1,866.12, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal, Status: Modified

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

Judgment For: Midland Funding L L C Judgment Against: Raymondo Galvan Sosa, Amount: $133.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs, Status: Modified

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

Judgment For: Midland Funding L L C Judgment Against: Raymondo Galvan Sosa, Amount: $503.85, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Modified

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

Judgment For: Midland Funding L L C Judgment Against: Raymondo Galvan Sosa, Amount: $2,910.84, Frequency: One Time, Type: Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment, Status: Modified

[+] Read More [-] Read Less