This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/07/2017 at 13:10:03 (UTC).

Midland Funding L L C VS Brent Rasmussen

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 Midland Funding L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Brent Rasmussen. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3078

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding L L C

Defendant

Brent Rasmussen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon Crane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/06/2017

OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:2/6/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2017

NOTE: ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2017

MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:2/3/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2017

NOTE: Ex Parte Motion For Additional Time To Serve

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2016

COM - Complaint (docket date:10/21/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2016

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:10/21/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2016

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:10/21/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less