This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 20:08:53 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc VS Ryan J Lawrence

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Midland Credit Management Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Ryan J Lawrence. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5231

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Ryan J Lawrence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Esther Simon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Midland Credit Management Inc Judgment Against: Ryan J Lawrence, Amount: $10,959.44, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Midland Credit Management Inc Judgment Against: Ryan J Lawrence, Amount: $428.09, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: VERIFIED /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less