This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 14:10:36 (UTC).

Michelle Smith VS Almer Jesse Smith

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Michelle Smith filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Almer Jesse Smith. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Beresky, Justin and Schwartz, Aryeh. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2195

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Beresky, Justin

Schwartz, Aryeh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michelle Smith

Respondent

Almer Jesse Smith

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nancy Bodinet

Respondent Attorney

Paul Nordini

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2021

DocketNOTE: Mothers Response and Objection to Request for Hearing and Request for Attorney Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021

DocketRES - Response (docket date:2/3/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketNOTE: Request for Hearing and or Non-Objection to Setting Matter on Inactive Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketRQH - Request For Hearing (docket date:1/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2021

DocketNOTE: Accelerated Motion to Continue on Inactive Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2021

DocketMCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar (docket date:1/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2020

DocketNOTE: Motion to Strike Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Pursuant to ARFLP Rule 29 (e) and Petitioners Response to Motion to Dismiss and Request for Attorney Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2020

DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:12/1/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2020

DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:11/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
07/10/2020

Docket019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:7/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2020

DocketNOTE: Petitioners Notice of Change of Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2020

DocketNJR - Notice of change of Judge for right (docket date:7/6/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2020

DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:6/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2020

DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:6/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:6/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:6/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:6/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:6/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:6/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less