This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:02:19 (UTC).

Michael E Elizondo VS Jayden Thomas Wooden Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Michael E Elizondo filed an Other lawsuit against Jayden Thomas Wooden. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1735

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael E Elizondo

Defendants

Jayden Thomas Wooden

Lisa M Wooden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Lundin

Defendant Attorney

Stephen Aiken

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SEPARATE ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS, JAYDEN THOMAS WOODEN AND LISA M. WOODEN/ eFile Billing $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JAYDEN WOODEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less