This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 18:56:16 (UTC).

Michael Dexter VS Sarah Dexter

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Michael Dexter filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sarah Dexter. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Marwil, Suzanne. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6889

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Marwil, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Dexter

Respondents

Sarah Dexter

Sarah Marie Turcotte

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOCS - Order For Child Support (docket date:1/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: Early Resolution Conference; Result: Full Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketERC - Early Resolution Management Conference (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/3/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less