This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/28/2016 at 04:22:20 (UTC).

Mercedes-Benz Financial Services U S A, L L C VS Frank A Hogan

Case Summary

On 01/09/2015 Mercedes-Benz Financial Services U S A, L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Frank A Hogan. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1126

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercedes-Benz Financial Services U S A, L L C

Defendant

Frank A Hogan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Whipple

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/17/2015

DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:3/25/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2015

NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2015

MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:3/12/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2015

NOTE: Motion and Affidavit for Entry of Judgment by Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/12/2015

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:2/12/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2015

AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:2/10/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2015

NOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default/Entry of Default and Notice of Application for Entry of Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2015

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/23/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2015

NOTE: FRANK HOGAN AND JANE DOE HOGAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2015

SUM - Summons (docket date:1/23/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2015

COM - Complaint (docket date:1/12/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2015

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:1/12/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2015

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:1/12/2015)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less