This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/20/2020 at 11:42:32 (UTC).

Melissa Peterson VS Joshua Schoenberger

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Melissa Peterson filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Joshua Schoenberger. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Sinclair, Joan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6882

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Sinclair, Joan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Melissa Peterson

Respondent

Joshua Schoenberger

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ashley Donovan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less