This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 17:35:55 (UTC).

Melissa Ann Giunigi VS Kelly Arnold Mears

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Melissa Ann Giunigi filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kelly Arnold Mears. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is VandenBerg, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1635

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

VandenBerg, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Melissa Ann Giunigi

Respondent

Kelly Arnold Mears

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:5/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Docket025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry (docket date:5/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:2/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: Early Resolution Conference; Result: No Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:1/29/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:1/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketUPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name (docket date:1/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketERC - Early Resolution Management Conference (docket date:12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/18/2019) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/30/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/30/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/30/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/30/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/30/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/30/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less