This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 15:36:01 (UTC).

Maryanne Abraham, Timothy J Leahy Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 Maryanne Abraham, Timothy J Leahy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bustamante, Lori. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0829

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bustamante, Lori

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Maryanne Abraham

Decedent

Timothy J Leahy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John Martin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/26/2018

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:3/29/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2018

PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:3/8/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2018

NOTE: NOTICE OF INFORMAL PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND INFORMATION TO HEIRS/DEVISEES AND LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

APE - Application/Petition (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

DCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NOTE: MARYANNE ABRAHAM UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NOT - Notice (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NOTE: TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NOT - Notice (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NOTE: TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NIP - Notice Of Informal Probate (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NOTE: MARYANNE ABRAHAM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

LTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:3/2/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

NOTE: MARYANNE ABRAHAM WITHOUT RESTRICTION PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

WIL - Will (docket date:3/6/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less