This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 07:09:27 (UTC).

Mark Brnovich Et Al VS Deborah Ann Butler Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Mark Brnovich filed an Other lawsuit against Deborah Ann Butler. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodman, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1728

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brodman, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mark Brnovich

State Of Arizona

Defendants

Mark Anthony Smith

Deborah Ann Butler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alyse Meislik

Defendant Attorney

Percival Bradley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.R.C.P. RULE 16(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief / Co-Chg $333.00 Rec # 27957299

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less