This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 18:56:03 (UTC).

Maritza Abigail Sanchez VS Andres Cervantes

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Maritza Abigail Sanchez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Andres Cervantes. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rogers, Joshua. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6886

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rogers, Joshua

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Maritza Abigail Sanchez

Respondent

Andres Cervantes

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:1/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketOCS - Order For Child Support (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:1/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNOTE: B/ PARENTING PLAN FOR SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING TO MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEXH - Exhibit (docket date:1/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: Early Resolution Conference; Result: Full Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:10/8/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less