This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 07:05:49 (UTC).

Maria L Quintana

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Maria L Quintana was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Popham, Jr, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1660

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Popham, Jr, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria L Quintana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ON SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSWD - Supp Appl For Waiver/Deferral of Costs (docket date:12/31/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of order mailed/provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOCN - Order Change of Name (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less