This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 06:46:37 (UTC).

Maria D Navarrete, Party is a minor: name not published Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Maria D Navarrete, Party is a minor name not published was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Marquoit, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3884

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Marquoit, Thomas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Maria D Navarrete

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Alfonso Leon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNOTE: PROBATE / $4028.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court (docket date:3/1/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNOTE: $4028.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court (docket date:2/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNOTE: MARIA D NAVARRETE/ WITH RESTRICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:2/2/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket421- Appoint Guardian/Consev (docket date:1/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: Guardian/Conservator - Minor; Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: AND SETTLEMENT OF A CLAIM FOR A MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOCM - Order Appt Conservator Of Minor Child (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ISRAEL NARARRETE BRAVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCAP - Consent To Appointment (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less