This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/28/2020 at 02:29:13 (UTC).

Manny G Martinez VS Dalia G Martinez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Manny G Martinez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Dalia G Martinez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Marvin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6859

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Davis, Marvin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Manny G Martinez

Respondent

Dalia G Martinez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jon McAvoy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less