This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:59:45 (UTC).

Manistee Ranch Community Association VS Arizona Home Foreclosure Prevention Funding Corporation Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Manistee Ranch Community Association filed an Other lawsuit against Arizona Home Foreclosure Prevention Funding Corporation. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephens, Sherry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1701

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Stephens, Sherry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manistee Ranch Community Association

Defendants

State Of Arizona

Selina Ivy

Arizona Home Foreclosure Prevention Funding Corporation

Delvagus E Ivy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Defendant Attorney

Davina Bressler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: 1. That per A.R.S. 33-1807, and due to its status as the holder of the deed of trust recorded in the Maricopa County Recorders Office under Document No. 20120869785 Recorded on September 26, 2012, any right or interest of AHFPFC in and to that real property described as: Lot 103 of Manistee Ranch Parcel 3, according to the plat of record in the office of the County Recorder of Maricopa County, Arizona, recorded in Book 497 of Maps, Page 16. Aka: 5239 W Kaler Circle, Glendale is inferior and subordinate to the rights, lien and interest of the Association in and to Lot 103, arising out of its statutory lien that is the subject of this civil action; 2. That the above-described interest of AHFPFC in Lot 103 will be extinguished, released and wiped out upon a Sheriffs Sale occurring against Lot 103 arising out of a Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure in favor of the Association and against Defendants Delvagus E. Ivy and Selina Ivy (Defendants) subject to any rights of redemption that Defendant may have in Lot 103, including but not limited to AHFPFCs right to make a claim to any excess monies available after a Sheriffs Sale on Lot 103 and subject to AHFPFCs right to receive payment of any such excess monies pursuant to applicable law; 3. That absent the completion of said Sheriffs Sale, AHFPFCs (including its affiliates, investors, predecessors, successors, assigns, authorized agents, or other holders of the promissory note secured by the aforementioned deed of trust) rights and interest in Lot 103 and its lien thereupon shall remain unaffected by this Judgment and shall be in full force and effect; 4. The Judgment in this matter and Sheriffs Sale, if any, shall not affect AHFPFCs (including its affiliates, investors, predecessors, successors, assigns, authorized agents, or other holders of the promissory note secured by the aforementioned deed of trust) rights and remedies as to the borrower under the promissory note, in any other way, 2. The Judgment in this matter and Sheriffs Sale, if any, shall not bar, extinguish, and/or waive any claim by AHFPFC to excess proceeds available after such Sheriffs Sale; 3. That any excess proceeds available after such Sheriffs Sale shall be paid to any person, including AHFPFC, having junior lien to Plaintiffs in order of priority pursuant to applicable law, upon proper submission to establish amounts owed to any such junior lien holder, including AHFPFC, and in order of priority; 4. That no monetary award is sought against AHFPFC and the parties agree to bear their own costs and attorneys fees in regard to each other. 5. The Association shall provide AHFPFC a copy of any judgment and decree of foreclosure issued in this matter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: STIPULATION TO LIEN PRIORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSTP - Stipulation (docket date:12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Manistee Ranch Community Association Judgment Against: Selina Ivy, Amount: $5,852.48, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSTJ - Stipulated Judgment (docket date:11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Settlement Agreement & COVENANT NOT TO EXECUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:11/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Limited Disclaimer of Interest of the State of Arizona / co-chrg Receipt # 27989509

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less