Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/26/2016 at 19:16:39 (UTC).

M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank Et Al VS Daytona Beach Resort L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2008 M I Marshall Ilsley Bank filed an Other lawsuit against Daytona Beach Resort L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, Aimee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9655

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, Aimee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank

L K Y/ Copper Mountain Investment Limited Partnership L L L P

L Y M Acquisition L L C

Defendants

Daytona Beach Resort L L C

W H M Paloma Investments L L C

W Harrison Merrill

W H M Copper Mountain Investments L L C

C M R/casa Grande L L C

Big Bend Investments L L C

Big Wash Investments L L C

James W Austell

Merrill Trust Communities And Resorts L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

K REYNOLDS

RICHARD LORENZEN

Defendant Attorney

Catherine Conner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • NOTE: PARTIAL RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • JOR - Judgment And Order (docket date:11/2/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • NOTE: FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:11/2/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING PARTIESWITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • STA - Statement (docket date:11/1/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • NOTE: MI Marshall Ilsley Banks Statement of No Objection to Stipulated Motion for Final Judgment Filed on October 20, 2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:11/1/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss Parties with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2009
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:4/2/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:4/2/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:3/25/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • NOTE: AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default (docket date:3/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • NOTE: W H MERRILL 12-22-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:3/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:11/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less