This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/05/2020 at 23:57:16 (UTC).

Lourdes Labansat VS George Labansat

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Lourdes Labansat filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against George Labansat. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are VandenBerg, Lisa and Pineda, Susanna. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1756

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

VandenBerg, Lisa

Pineda, Susanna

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Lourdes Labansat

Lourdes Mendez

Respondent

George Labansat

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:4/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:3/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:3/4/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:2/20/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:2/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:1/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:12/11/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:12/6/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:12/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:12/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:12/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:12/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:12/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:12/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less