This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 11:31:37 (UTC).

Louis Robert Newsome VS Susan Lynn Newsome

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Louis Robert Newsome filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Susan Lynn Newsome. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponce, Adele. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6901

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ponce, Adele

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Louis Robert Newsome

Respondent

Susan Lynn Newsome

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Donald Colburn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF A NON-COVENANT MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less