This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 07:05:33 (UTC).

Lori Smith VS American Leadership Academy Inc

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Lori Smith filed an Other lawsuit against American Leadership Academy Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephens, Sherry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1727

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Stephens, Sherry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Smith

Defendant

American Leadership Academy Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mack Jones

Defendant Attorney

Anne Barber

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:1/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Firm Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMERICAN LEADERSHIP ACADEMYS CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMERICAN LEADERSHIP ACADEMYS Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMERICAN LEADERSHIP ACADEMY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less