This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 08:30:00 (UTC).

Lori A Williams VS Thomas Williams

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Lori A Williams filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Thomas Williams. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Sinclair, Joan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4682

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Sinclair, Joan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lori A Williams

Respondent

Thomas Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney (docket date:12/6/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney (docket date:11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:10/8/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:10/2/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketQDO - Qualified Dom Rel Order (docket date:8/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNOTE: STIPULATED / FOR ENTRY OF QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:8/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNLR Notice Of Limited Scope Representation (docket date:8/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:8/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:7/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:7/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:7/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:7/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:7/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:7/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less