This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 20:30:57 (UTC).

Lizette Oliveros VS Jose Angel Acosta

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Lizette Oliveros filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Jose Angel Acosta. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5677

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lizette Oliveros

Respondent

Jose Angel Acosta

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kristen Dewitt-Lopez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Waiving any requirement for service on Respondent Father, as Father is deceased. 2. Entering a judgment that Jose Angel Acosta is the natural Father of the child, Jose Angel Acosta Oliveros Jr., born February 27, 2018; 3. Ordering the Clerk of this Court to send a certified copy of the paternity order to the Office of Vital Records, Department of Health Services, which shall establish, pursuant to A.R.S. 36-323, a new birth certificate for the child reflecting the name of the natural father

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOL - Notice of Lodging (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketREQ - Request (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less