This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/25/2016 at 18:23:58 (UTC).

Linda Musulin Et Al VS Gene Nickerson Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2008 Linda Musulin filed an Other lawsuit against Gene Nickerson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7373

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Musulin

Sun Valley Assemblage L L C

Rebecca Smith

Michael S Musulin

Powell B Gillenwater

S D I Real Estate Consultants L L C

Roger L Smith

Defendants

Gene Nickerson

Sun Valley I Limited Partnership

Don Thoren

Sun Valley I I Limited Partnership

Neil Chloupek

Others

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Maynard Cronin Erickson Curran & Sparks P L C

Intervenor

Alst L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Polese

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL MAYNARD

Intervenor Attorney

Michael Stark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2012
  • DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet (docket date:3/5/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • LED - 2.8 (d) Letter (docket date:12/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit (docket date:8/31/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • NOTE: $500.00/ MAYNARD CRONIN ERICKSON CURRAN & SPARKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond (docket date:8/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • NOTE: ORDER RELEASING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond (docket date:6/18/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • NOTE: MOTION TO RELEASE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated (docket date:6/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:6/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2008
  • OBJ - Objection/Opposition. (docket date:9/5/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • NOTE: TO REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO CONFIRM ARBITRAITON AWARD AND DEFENDANTS' CROSS APPLICAITON TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • OBJ - Objection/Opposition. (docket date:8/22/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • NOTE: TO APPLICATION TO CONFIRM FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND APPLICATION TO VACATE AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:8/25/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • REQ - Request (docket date:8/25/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • NOTE: FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO CONFIRM FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • ACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:8/4/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • NOTE: ACCEPTED SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS ON07/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/24/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less