Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 11:03:32 (UTC).

Leroy L Lucero Et Al VS State Of Arizona Department Of Corrections Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2009 Leroy L Lucero filed an Other lawsuit against State Of Arizona Department Of Corrections. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3621

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leroy L Lucero

Glenda Palmer

Defendants

State Of Arizona Department Of Corrections

Tara Diaz

State Of Arizona

Dora B Schriro

Robin Smithson

Mark Versluis

Robert Stewart

Preston Gamblin

Greg Fizer

Herb Haley

Tony Valenzuela

Unknown Bittman

In Re

Danielle Lucero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Doyle

Defendant Attorney

Michael Gottfried

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2009
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:11/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • NOTE: SERVED PRESTON GAMBLIN 8/13/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:9/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:9/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:9/8/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/10/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • NOTE: SERVED 8/27/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:9/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court (docket date:8/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • NOTE: HERB HALEY 8-11-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • NOTE: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS 8-11-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:8/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:8/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:8/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less