Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/28/2016 at 16:22:05 (UTC).

Lennar Communities Development Inc Et Al VS American Openings Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2015 Lennar Communities Development Inc filed an Other lawsuit against American Openings Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3105

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lennar Communities Development Inc

Greystone Homes Inc

Greystone Construction Inc

U S Home Corporation

U S Home Of Arizona Construction Co

Defendants

American Openings Inc

Andrew Lauren Granite L L C

Holmes-Halley Industries

Artistic Stairs / C P I Arizona L L C

Banker Insulation

Chas Roberts Air Conditioning Inc

H D Supply Inc

Granite Creations

Greco Painting Inc

Hansen-Kramer Stucco Incorporated

K C H Electric

Headlee Roofing Company

Holderness Building Materials Inc

Integrated Wall Systems Inc

Interior Logic Holdings

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamie Mayrose

Other Attorneys

William Doyle

Susan Dana-Kobey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:4/7/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • NOTE: Order EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 30 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:3/1/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • NOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service and Extend Time on Inactive Calendar or in the alternative Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • NOTE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs have an additional four months or until February 29, 2016 to serve all Defendants and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending this case on the inactive calendar until March 25, 2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:11/2/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • NOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service and Extend Time on Inactive Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:7/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:7/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2015
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:4/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT VW DIG, LLCS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:4/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT VW DIG, LLCS CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:4/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT VW DIG, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT/ E-FILE BILLING $237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:2/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:2/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less