This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/04/2021 at 16:58:40 (UTC).

Lendmark Financial Services L L C VS Jinger Moll Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Lendmark Financial Services L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Jinger Moll. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1683

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lendmark Financial Services L L C

Defendants

Jinger Moll

Larry Moll

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Andersen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket049 - ME: Judgment Signed (docket date:2/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Lendmark Financial Services L L C Judgment Against: Jinger Moll Judgment Against: Larry Moll, Amount: $15,413.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Lendmark Financial Services L L C Judgment Against: Jinger Moll Judgment Against: Larry Moll, Amount: $1,500.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Lendmark Financial Services L L C Judgment Against: Jinger Moll Judgment Against: Larry Moll, Amount: $542.80, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDJU - Default Judgment (docket date:2/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit of ATTORNEYS FEES AND STATEMENT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Entry of Judgment by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JINGER MOLL AND LARRY MOLL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service (docket date:12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less