This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 18:25:45 (UTC).

Leah Linda Whetsell VS Michael Charles Whetsell

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Leah Linda Whetsell filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Michael Charles Whetsell. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rea, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3013

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rea, John

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Leah Linda Whetsell

Leah Linda Astgen

Respondent

Michael Charles Whetsell

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Decree Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISIN-MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:12/7/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOCS - Order For Child Support (docket date:12/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/19/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less