Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/04/2016 at 02:41:42 (UTC).

Lawrence Jonathan Lee VS Liz Ybara Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2010 Lawrence Jonathan Lee filed an Other lawsuit against Liz Ybara. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6542

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Jonathan Lee

Defendants

Liz Ybara

City Of Phoenix

State Of Arizona

County Of Maricopa

Frank Conti

Maricopa County Sheriffs Office

Dreamy Draw Justice Court

Joe Arpaio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keith Knowlton

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Serbalik

Jonathon Dutcher

Peter Muthig

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2011
  • 044 - ME: Case Reinstated (docket date:9/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:9/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:8/31/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • NOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:7/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT CITY OF PHOENIX NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED RULE 54(B) ORDER DIRECTING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE CITY OF PHOENIX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • 079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial (docket date:6/20/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/15/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • NOTE: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:4/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2010
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:12/6/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:12/6/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:12/6/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:12/6/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:12/9/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:12/3/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • NOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:11/10/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:8/4/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:8/4/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less