This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/05/2020 at 04:21:21 (UTC).

Lavon R Carriveau VS Rene W Carriveau

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Lavon R Carriveau filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Rene W Carriveau. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Pineda, Susanna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1033

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Pineda, Susanna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lavon R Carriveau

Respondent

Rene W Carriveau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

R O'Brien

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less