This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:01:27 (UTC).

Lauri Hart VS Estate Of Veronica Nez, The Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Lauri Hart filed an Other lawsuit against Estate Of Veronica Nez, The. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Kiley, Daniel and Russell, Andrew. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1724

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Kiley, Daniel

Russell, Andrew

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lauri Hart

Defendants

Georgiana Warren

Estate Of Veronica Nez, The

Veronica Nez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin Mathers

Defendant Attorneys

James Ledbetter

Jennifer Peddy Berg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Georgiana Warren's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment (docket date:2/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Georgiana Warren's Separate Statement of Facts in Support of her Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSOF - Statement Of Facts (docket date:2/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Strike Acceptance of Service or Motion to Stay Current Proceedings / EFILE BILLING $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:1/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance and Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint / JOSEPH DAGUANNO SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR/ PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEFENDANT ESTATE OF VERONICA NEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketWSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons (docket date:1/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service Re: Defendant the estate of Veronica Nez only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE / GEORGIANA WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less