This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 07:32:37 (UTC).

Laura Ann Pedersen VS Bryan Daniel Pedersen

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Laura Ann Pedersen filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Bryan Daniel Pedersen. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is VandenBerg, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1707

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

VandenBerg, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Laura Ann Pedersen

Respondent

Bryan Daniel Pedersen

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:10/5/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED/ JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:10/1/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less