This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/24/2016 at 16:45:48 (UTC).

L V N V Funding L L C VS Lyndie Savage

Case Summary

On 03/28/2007 L filed an Other lawsuit against N. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Morrow, James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4047

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Morrow, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L V N V Funding L L C

Defendant

Lyndie Savage

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/13/2013

SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:6/14/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2013

NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2012

ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment (docket date:6/25/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2012

NOTE: Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment / eFile Billing $26.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2007

DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:9/10/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2007

NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2007

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:8/29/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2007

ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees (docket date:8/23/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2007

SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:8/24/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2007

AFF - Affidavit (docket date:8/23/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
07/17/2007

NOTE: SERVED LYNDIE SAVAGE ON 06/30/07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/04/2007

322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:7/4/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2007

ORD - Order (docket date:5/25/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2007

NOTE: AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE METHOD OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2007

AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/2/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2007

SUM - Summons (docket date:5/2/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2007

MOT - Motion (docket date:5/2/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2007

NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE METHOD OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2007

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/29/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2007

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:3/29/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less