This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 04:46:01 (UTC).

Kurt Danon Law VS Larry Hoel

Case Summary

On 03/05/2008 Kurt Danon Law filed an Other lawsuit against Larry Hoel. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Oberbillig, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0459

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Oberbillig, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kurt Danon Law

Defendant

Larry Hoel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Elan Mizrahi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/08/2009

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:1/12/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2009

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2009

SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:1/12/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2009

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2008

078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:12/10/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2008

005 - ME: Hearing (docket date:11/26/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2008

STA - Statement (docket date:11/17/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2008

NOTE: DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIMANT LAWRENCE HOEL JR'S SUPPLEMENTAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2008

STA - Statement (docket date:11/12/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2008

NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
03/05/2008

NOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:3/7/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

NOTE: SAN TAN JUSTICE COURT / ORIGINAL DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE HOEL JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

MTT - Motion To Transfer (docket date:3/7/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

NOTE: SAN TAN JUSTICE COURT / TO SUPERIOR COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

RES - Response (docket date:3/7/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

NOTE: SAN TAN JUSTICE COURT ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM OF LAWRENCE HOEL JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

NAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:3/7/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

NOTE: SAN TAN JUSTICE COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/7/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2008

NOTE: SAN TAN JUSTICE COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less