This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 22:41:27 (UTC).

Kristine Lindely, Steven Lindely Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Kristine Lindely, Steven Lindely was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kalman, Amy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3912

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kalman, Amy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kristine Lindely

Decedent

Steven Lindely

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Steven Wagner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:12/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR AUTHORITY TO ASSIGN RESTITUTION PAYMENTS TO VICTIMS HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF INFORMAL APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JENNIFER ERIN MISCHKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketREN - Renunciation & Nomination (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketOPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: KRISTINE LINDELY / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW / PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: KRISTINE LINDELY / WITHOUT RESTRICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less